MICHAEL GUEST CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity supports the works of other UK registered charities by the making of donations or grants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 November 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHARLES MARMENT | Chair | 30 October 2013 |
|
|||||
Susana Patten | Trustee | 17 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lydia Marie Shepherd | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Shepherd | Trustee | 23 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.18k | £31.87k | £55.07k | £248.40k | £189.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.13k | £34.10k | £67.96k | £165.54k | £241.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2023 | 315 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 December 2023 | 315 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 04 OCT 2013
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SUCH PURPOSES THAT ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE IN PARTICULAR BY SUPPORTING THE WORKS OF OTHER REGISTERED CHARITIES BY THE MAKING OF DONATIONS OR GRANTS FROM INCOME AND CAPITAL AVAILABLE FOR DISTRIBUTION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wilson Browne Llp
Kettering Parkway
Kettering Venture Park
Kettering
NN15 6WN
- Phone:
- 01536410014
- Email:
- nmaher@wilsonbrowne.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window