YAD AVSHALOM LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY SUPPORTS CHARITIES THAT ACCORD WITH THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY, NAMELY THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH RELIGION, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ALLEVIATION OF POVERTY AND OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
Governance
- 11 December 2013: Standard registration
- NONE (Working name)
- V F FOUNDATION LIMITED (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Weiler | Trustee | 16 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Weiler | Trustee | 16 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Riki Greenberg | Trustee | 16 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Weiler | Trustee | 15 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
IRWIN LEO WEILER | Trustee | 23 October 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £990 | £6.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £553 | £836 | £270 | £4.76k | £651 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 November 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04 APR 2012 as amended on 09 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (“OBJECTS”) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: THE ADVANCEMENT AND FURTHERANCE OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH RELIGION THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE ALLEVIATION OF POVERTY THROUGHOUT THE WORLD THE FURTHERANCE OF SUCH OTHER OBJECTS THAT ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 LYTTELTON ROAD
LONDON
N2 0EF
- Phone:
- 02087310777
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window