Accounts and annual returns STARDUST MAJORETTES

Charity Number: 1156370
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2018 13 November 2020 379 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 08 November 2018 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required