PURE SPORT FOUNDATION LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We have provided education, inclusion and participation opportunities. We have provided sporting, educational and social opportunities for local people. We use sport to tackle social exclusion and social deprivation in order to develop long term economic improvement. We deliver projects focused on increasing physical activity focusing on improving health and reducing obesity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Staffordshire
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 06 February 2014: Standard registration
- 20 February 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- PURE SPORT FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.69k | £0 | £5.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.25k | £0 | £4.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 02 September 2018 | 214 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 02 September 2018 | 579 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/04/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 05/09/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29/01/2014
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH,AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY,FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window