Accounts and annual returns CHRIST APOSTOLIC CHURCH (GILGAL)

Charity number: 1154318
Charity reporting is overdue by 814 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 83 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 83 days
Annual return 05 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 449 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 449 days
Annual return 05 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 814 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 814 days
Annual return 05 April 2021 18 March 2022 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 06 March 2022 394 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required