EMMANUEL BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Church holds weekly Sunday worship services, Sunday School and a mid-week prayer and Bible study meeting . It also runs weekly parents and toddlers group, a weekly meeting for senior citizens and weekly clubs for primary and secondary school ages, a coffee morning and a foodbank. These activities are all open to the local community. The Church also supports missionary work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cardiff
Governance
- 09 January 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN BASTON | Chair | 15 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Paul James Worthy | Trustee | 16 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dewi Gwilym Brady | Trustee | 16 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Samuel Ng Lap Li | Trustee | 16 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Paul David Whiteley | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew John Lansdown | Trustee | 08 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Rees | Trustee | 15 November 2013 |
|
|||||
JONATHAN BASTON | Trustee | 15 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
BEN LEWIS JONES | Trustee | 15 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
GARETH DAVIES | Trustee | 15 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN GLYN ELLIS | Trustee | 15 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £90.30k | £107.13k | £103.70k | £141.60k | £130.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £90.80k | £103.90k | £101.32k | £105.62k | £132.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08 FEB 2012
Charitable objects
(1)THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN GABALFA, CARDIFF AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD; AND (2)SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL, IN THE OPINION OF THE MANAGING TRUSTEES FURTHER THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Emmanuel Baptist Church
Gabalfa Avenue
CARDIFF
CF14 2SH
- Phone:
- 07771904995
- Email:
- info@emmanuelcardiff.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window