The Pear Tree Fund

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide information, advice and holistic support to anyone with a life-changing illness or long-term condition who lives in East Suffolk and neighbouring parts of Mid Suffolk and South Norfolk, and to families and carers. Services and support are provided from the Pear Tree Centre in Halesworth, or by telephone, online and in the home.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 21 January 2014: CIO registration
- 05 February 2015: Funds received from 1036571 THE HALESWORTH COMMUNITY NURSING CARE FUND
- Pear Tree Centre (Working name)
- HALESWORTH COMMUNITY NURSING CARE FUND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Duncan Empey | Chair | 24 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sean Verrall | Trustee | 06 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Candace Tamsyn Imison | Trustee | 26 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Guy Peryer | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Debra Jane Willetts | Trustee | 18 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip John King | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr DINAH CECELIA MORLEY | Trustee | 09 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA JANE SAWKINS | Trustee | 10 October 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £155.57k | £263.12k | £256.20k | £205.80k | £229.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £136.92k | £259.04k | £307.71k | £299.12k | £324.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.00k | £53.30k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 15 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 15 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 November 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 November 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 21 Jan 2014 as amended on 27 Nov 2018 as amended on 16 Jul 2020 as amended on 07 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
To support people with a life limiting illness who are registered with Cutlers Hill Surgery, by the provision of nursing care, practical support and equipment; and To provide information and support at the Pear Tree Centre to people living in Halesworth and the surrounding area, who either themselves or a member of their family have a life limiting illness.
Area of benefit
HALESWORTH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pear Tree Centre
Bungay Road
HALESWORTH
Suffolk
IP19 8SG
- Phone:
- 01986 899655
- Email:
- info@peartreefund.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window