PANCREATIC CANCER RESEARCH FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity offers project grants for pancreatic cancer research to researchers in the UK and Ireland.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
Total income:
£1,462,326
Donations and legacies | £1.23m | |
Charitable activities | £24.80k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £207.30k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£659,665
Raising funds | £11.12k | |
Charitable activities | £648.54k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £11.12k | |
Charitable expenditure | £648.54k | |
Retained for future use | £802.66k |
People

1 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 14 January 2014: Standard registration
- PCRF (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Henry Collen | Trustee | 15 January 2014 |
|
|||||
BRIAN RAPER | Trustee | 15 January 2014 |
|
|||||
Peter Joseph Michael Blanks | Trustee | 15 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET BLANKS | Trustee | 29 October 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.07m | £1.15m | £1.35m | £1.37m | £1.46m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.70m | £412.88k | £2.20m | £1.53m | £659.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.01m | £1.08m | £1.31m | £1.30m | £1.23m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £37.81k | £45.10k | £31.32k | £34.19k | £24.80k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £23.47k | £25.04k | £6.39k | £32.80k | £207.30k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £791.57k | £183.90k | £101.97k | £177.66k | £147.67k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.69m | £399.07k | £2.18m | £1.53m | £648.54k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £18.01k | £13.82k | £11.81k | £0 | £11.12k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £24.11k | £2.40k | £2.40k | £2.75k | £15.79k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £2.37m | £138.50k | £2.00m | £1.36m | £545.80k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £8.85m | £8.90m | £8.45m | £8.59m | £8.88m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £4.85m | £4.17m | £4.56m | £4.87m | £4.35m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 30 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 30 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10 SEP 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/01/2014
Charitable objects
4.1 THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE RESTRICTED SPECIFICALLY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT FOR: 4.1.1 THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO THE CONSTITUTION AND PATHOLOGY OF THE PANCREAS AND CAUSES AND TREATMENT OF DISEASE OF THE PANCREAS, WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO PANCREATIC CANCER ON TERMS THAT THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH ARE PUBLISHED; 4.1.2 THE RELIEF OF PATIENTS SUFFERING FROM PANCREATIC CANCER; 4.1.3 THE RELIEF IN CASES OF FINANCIAL NEED OF THE DEPENDANTS OF SUCH PATIENTS OR DECEASED PATIENTS; 4.1.4 THE PROMOTION OF SUCH CHARITABLE OBJECTS CONCERNED WITH MEDICAL RESEARCH OR THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AS THE BOARD SHALL IN ITS ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pancreatic Cancer Research Fund
51 Cheyne Walk
LONDON
N21 1DB
- Phone:
- 02083601119
- Email:
- info@pcrf.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window