THE DUTCH CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To educate the public in and promote Dutch arts, music, language and the Dutch cultural heritage, in particular (but without limitation) by the provision of a Dutch cultural centre in London and to advance and promote the preservation and conservation of the Dutch church at Austin Friars for the benefit of the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout London
- Scotland
Governance
- 29 April 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anton Valk | Chair | 09 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Marieke Janneke Albeda | Trustee | 08 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ellen Milan | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marinus Rovers | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Sas | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jeff Tijssen | Trustee | 11 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Jean-Jacques van Helten | Trustee | 24 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Frederik Vogels | Trustee | 24 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bertjan van de Lagemaat | Trustee | 12 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Michiel Kermer | Trustee | 21 March 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.53k | £26.17k | £45.81k | £77.19k | £68.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.69k | £25.96k | £45.80k | £68.15k | £88.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24 APR 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29/04/2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (OBJECTS) ARE (1) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN AND PROMOTE DUTCH ARTS, MUSIC, LANGUAGE AND THE DUTCH CULTURAL HERITAGE, IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) BY THE PROVISION OF A DUTCH CULTURAL CENTRE IN LONDON AND (2) TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION AND CONSERVATION OF THE DUTCH CHURCH AT AUSTIN FRIARS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE DUTCH CHURCH
7 AUSTIN FRIARS
LONDON
EC2N 2HA
- Phone:
- 02075881684
- Email:
- info@dutchcentre.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window