SOUL FOOD SPACES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Soul Food Spaces promotes physical, mental and spiritual well-being through the creation of spaces and settings where people can come together and share food and talk honestly about aspects of their lives as a means of finding acceptance, connection, meaning and community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 15 July 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr John Carpenter | Chair | 15 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Una Mcnicholl | Trustee | 05 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Beldevie Hurazene Moubiri | Trustee | 15 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kath Hayward | Trustee | 12 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
OLLIE BATCHELOR | Trustee | 10 December 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.65k | £822 | £2.32k | £6.19k | £10.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.51k | £735 | £1.65k | £3.19k | £4.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 15 Jul 2014
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN. 2. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (I) THE PROVISION OF EMERGENCY FOOD TO INDIVIDUALS IN FINANCIAL NEED. (II) SUPPORTING AND COOPERATING WITH CHARITIES AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. 3. TO PROMOTE GOOD MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING SESSIONS IN MEDITATION AND DELIVERING THE FIVE WAYS TO WELLBEING PROGRAMME. 4. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING TRAINING AND MENTORING IN MEDITATION. 5. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 Albert Drive
Gateshead
NE9 6EH
- Phone:
- 07780520092
- Email:
- admin@soulfoodspaces.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window