ACID SURVIVORS TRUST INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
- Promote and protect the health of acid burns survivors - Advance the education of the general public in all areas relating to acid burn survivors with view to eliminating acid and burn violence worldwide
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Newham
- Tower Hamlets
- Colombia
- India
Governance
- 10 December 2013: CIO registration
- ASTI (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sue Arrowsmith | Trustee | 07 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peregrine Edward Quintin Cust | Trustee | 21 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Shampa Nath | Trustee | 26 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Horlick | Trustee | 26 May 2016 |
|
|||||
Ajay Gulati | Trustee | 04 April 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £135.52k | £122.87k | £91.25k | £350.19k | £282.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.27k | £94.70k | £93.98k | £201.47k | £292.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £32.13k | £15.04k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 04 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 10 Dec 2013
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF ACID AND BURN VIOLENCE SURVIVORS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF AN INTEGRATED PROGRAMME OF CARE AND SUPPORT TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO ACID AND BURN VIOLENCE SURVIVORS BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT WITH A VIEW TO ELIMINATING ACID AND BURN VIOLENCE WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fora Space Ltd
42-46 Princelet Street
LONDON
E1 5LP
- Phone:
- 02036513933
- Email:
- office@asti.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window