MY TACTICS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
My Tactics is currently exploring support areas of education with other partners to help people get back into work or undertake training activity. This has been in the field of sports and education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 October 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 December 2013: Standard registration
- 22 November 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/10/2014 | 01/10/2015 | 01/10/2016 | |
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 October 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 October 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 October 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 October 2016 | 01 November 2017 | 92 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/09/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16/12/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03/01/2014
Charitable objects
1.TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND TRAINING IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASONOF THEIR YOUTH,AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY,FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITION OF LIFE.2.TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 18-24 YEARS WHO ARE NOT IN EMPLOYMENT,TRAINING AND EDUCATION THROUGH:(A)THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE,DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE;(B)PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS,CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window