MALHAMDALE AGRICULTURAL AND HORTICULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1155490
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The improvement of Agriculture, Horticulture and Livestock Breeding.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £85,783
Total expenditure: £68,436

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
  • Animals
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 January 2014: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • MALHAM SHOW (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Phillip David Hargreaves Trustee 21 January 2020
None on record
JANET BOLLAND Trustee 31 October 2013
None on record
ANNIE HESELTINE Trustee 31 October 2013
None on record
Ashley Caton Trustee 31 October 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £56.92k £24.35k £60.17k £93.50k £85.78k
Total expenditure £41.50k £7.78k £46.14k £60.83k £68.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 20 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 20 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 27 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 20 December 2022 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 20 December 2022 50 days late
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 02 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Manor Barn
Calton
SKIPTON
North Yorkshire
BD23 4AD
Phone:
07958085141