BRIGHTON OPEN AIR THEATRE (BOAT)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education in arts and culture through the establishment, management and maintenance of an open air theatre in Brighton & Hove for the use of residents and visitors. The cultural facility operates from April to September each year and is based at Dyke Road Park in Hove. We present performance, spoken word, film, music and community events. It opened in May 2015.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Brighton And Hove
Governance
- 06 March 2014: CIO registration
- BOAT (Working name)
- BRIGHTON OPEN AIR THEATRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEVEN JOHN TURNER | Chair | 16 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Graeme Lance Hawkins | Trustee | 12 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jane Waller | Trustee | 12 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Dominic Frederick Boon | Trustee | 12 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Wolfe | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £279.26k | £348.30k | £398.02k | £387.48k | £400.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £245.18k | £280.49k | £329.35k | £370.94k | £360.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £500 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 06 Mar 2014 as amended on 01 May 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF ARTS AND CULTURE THROUGH THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF AN OPEN AIR THEATRE IN BRIGHTON & HOVE FOR THE USE OF RESIDENTS AND VISITORS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
42 Hove Park Road
HOVE
East Sussex
BN3 6LJ
- Phone:
- 07502619633
- Website:
-
brightonopenairtheatre.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window