Accounts and annual returns THE WILLIAM AND ELIZABETH MORRIS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1154491
Charity reporting is overdue by 1687 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 226 days
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 226 days
Annual return 30 November 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 592 days
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 592 days
Annual return 30 November 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 957 days
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 957 days
Annual return 30 November 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1322 days
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1322 days
Annual return 30 November 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1687 days
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1687 days