Financial history LITTLE ACTORS THEATRE COMPANY

Charity number: 1155249
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £87.25k £55.24k £67.08k £69.70k £60.65k
Total expenditure £86.41k £42.58k £70.86k £65.85k £59.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £6.12k £33.19k N/A £2.50k £3.50k