Trustees LITTLE ACTORS THEATRE COMPANY

Charity number: 1155249
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Molly Pinkus Trustee 25 April 2024
None on record
Joanna Harding Trustee 18 January 2024
None on record
Emma Templeman Trustee 20 October 2022
None on record
Ian Crichton Thomson Trustee 25 April 2020
None on record
Sheila Thomson Trustee 25 April 2020
None on record
Susan Kendall Trustee 09 October 2014
None on record