GRIFFIN FOUNDATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Offer grants to the local community to support those in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Thurrock
Governance
- 06 January 2014: Standard registration
- GRIFFIN-GRAYS FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN JOHN WEBB | Chair | 16 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
ASHLEY GARY FROMENT | Trustee | 16 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
SIMON JAMES WINDHAM | Trustee | 16 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2020 | 30/03/2021 | 30/03/2022 | 30/03/2023 | 30/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.56k | £6.92k | £9.72k | £412 | £2.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.97k | £3.54k | £1.99k | £9.33k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2021 | 21 March 2022 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2020 | 06 April 2021 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13/12/2013
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (CHARITABLE UNDER ENGLISH LAW) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND SUFFERING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY OF PEOPLE LIVING IN THURROCK, ESSEX AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, WHICH MAY BE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Griffin
4-6 Queensgate Centre
Orsett Road
GRAYS
RM17 5DF
- Phone:
- 01375397872
- Email:
- gft@griffin-grays.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window