SUNSHINE CAT RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relieving the suffering of cats and kittens in need of care and attention and providing and maintaining rescue homes or other facilities for the reception, care and treatment of such animals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 05 December 2013: CIO registration
- 02 December 2014: Funds received from 1149242 SUNSHINE CAT RESCUE
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
OLIVIA ANNE TYACK | Chair | 01 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Susan Carol Newitt | Trustee | 24 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Margaret Hauton | Trustee | 12 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.72k | £58.25k | £67.25k | £609.89k | £384.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.27k | £51.98k | £63.76k | £88.11k | £107.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £578.78k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £15.33k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £15.78k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £550.00k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £68.15k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £19.96k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.14k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.00k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 12 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 12 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 05 Dec 2013
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF CATS AND KITTENS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION, AND TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Insall Road
Chipping Norton
OX7 5LF
- Phone:
- 01608643142
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window