GURU GOBIND SINGH GURDWARA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Sikh Religion in the doctrine of the Sri Guru Granth Sahib Ji by: 1.Providing facilities for religious worship, ceremonies and celebrations of important religious festivals 2.To advance education for the public benefit in the Sikh ways of Life and worship among UK Citizens. 3.To promote the cause of mutual understanding and strengthen bonds between the Sikh and other communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
203 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 09 May 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lackwant Singh | Trustee | 19 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gurmeet Singh | Trustee | 19 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nanak Singh | Trustee | 19 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Suba Singh | Trustee | 19 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.10k | £51.19k | £50.90k | £53.22k | £93.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.89k | £38.04k | £53.56k | £65.00k | £73.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 19 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 19 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 May 2024 | 205 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 May 2024 | 205 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 April 2024 | 539 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 April 2024 | 539 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 March 2024 | 877 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28/04/2002 AS AMENDED ON 30/04/2014
Charitable objects
1.TO ADVANCE THE SIKH RELIGION IN BIRMINGHAM PARTICULARLY IN THE DOCTRINE OF THE SRI GURU GRANTH SAHIB JI IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY:A)PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR RELIGIOUS WORSHIP,CEREMONIES AND CELEBRATIONS OF IMPORTANT RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS.2.TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE SIKH WAYS OF LIFE AND WORSHIP AMONG UK CITIZENS.3.TO PROMOTE THE CAUSE OF MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AND STRENGTHEN BONDS BETWEEN THE SIKH AND OTHER COMMUNITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Guru Gobind Singh Gurdwara
221 MARY STREET
BALSALL HEATH
BIRMINGHAM
B12 9RN
- Phone:
- 0121 440 2358
- Email:
- gurdwaramaryst@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window