BARROW-UPON-SOAR COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities include quarterly publication of a village magazine, publication and dissemination of walks and information leaflets, managing the Community Library, running Pantomime and Youth Theatre groups, attempting to establish a new community building, Twinning Association, arranging events including entertainments and street markets, heritage activities etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £31,849 from 4 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
85 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 13 March 2014: CIO registration
- 21 October 2015: Funds received from 505692 THE BARROW-UPON-SOAR COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
- BUSCA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Frankie Stone | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Sadler | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roy Alan Bird | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steven Crossley | Trustee | 12 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Eluned Webb | Trustee | 16 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Craig O'Donnell Johnstone | Trustee | 02 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Judith Mary Rodgers | Trustee | 15 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
VAL GILLINGS | Trustee | 15 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
FRANCES JACKLYN THOMPSON | Trustee | 15 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID RODGERS | Trustee | 15 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
CERI FAIRBROTHER | Trustee | 15 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £78.90k | £48.25k | £43.40k | £81.36k | £93.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £70.57k | £45.14k | £40.22k | £72.16k | £95.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.67k | £28.60k | N/A | £29.35k | £31.85k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 13 Mar 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BARROW-UPON-SOAR AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Barrow upon Soar Library
33 North Street
Barrow upon Soar
LOUGHBOROUGH
LE12 8PZ
- Phone:
- 01509416356
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window