PENDLE DOGS IN NEED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PENDLE DOGS are a dog rescue serving the areas around Burnley and Pendle (All BB postcodes). We help with dogs who have been abandoned, are mistreated or need rehoming for some other reason.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
24 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Animals
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lancashire
Governance
- 13 January 2014: Standard registration
- PDIN (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAULA KNOWLES | Chair | 06 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Adam Draper | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Cutler | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
SHARON ASHLEY | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £109.49k | £111.69k | £117.40k | £221.40k | £149.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £112.47k | £104.28k | £121.16k | £220.89k | £149.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 29 February 2024 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 29 February 2024 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/12/2013 AS AMENDED ON 12/01/2014
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE,PROTECTION,TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS,MALTREATMENT,POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG ANIMALS
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Dogs Den
Primet Works
Greenfield Road
Colne
Lancashire
BB8 9PE
- Phone:
- 07944174737
- Email:
- pendledogs@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window