Accounts and annual returns ST. JOSEPH'S PTA, CRAYFORD

Charity number: 1154834
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 August 2024 07 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 01 August 2023 21 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 August 2022 21 December 2023 203 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 August 2021 09 June 2022 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 August 2020 09 June 2022 373 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 August 2020 Not Required