LEEDS JEWISH EDUCATIONAL CENTRE

Charity Number: 1154962
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity received donations during the year and paid out direct charitable activity, grants and support costs. Most of the costs relate to Leeds Kollel, an academy for advanced learning based in Leeds that also reaches out to the local Jewish community, as well as food support grants for families on low income.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023

Total income: £410,216
Total expenditure: £434,030

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Services
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Leeds City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 December 2013: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • LEEDS KOLLEL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BERNARD JOSEPH Chair 07 November 2013
None on record
Akiva Heimann Trustee 23 October 2022
None on record
MICHAEL JOSEPH Trustee 07 November 2013
SHEVES YOUTH ORGANISATION LIMITED
Received: On time
Heritage Support Network
Received: On time
PRESTWICH AHAVAS CHESED
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £346.00k £303.89k £321.08k £428.12k £410.22k
Total expenditure £350.70k £295.52k £304.77k £430.53k £434.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2023 30 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 30 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2022 30 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 30 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2021 28 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 28 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2020 30 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 30 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2019 23 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 23 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
431 BURY NEW ROAD
SALFORD
M7 4ED
Phone:
01617926515