Accounts and annual returns WAKEFIELD DISTRICT HARRIERS AND ATHLETIC CLUB
Charity number: 1155865

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 04 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 04 June 2024 | 340 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 694 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 May 2024 | 699 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1059 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 March 2022 | 273 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1424 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 March 2022 | 638 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1789 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window