CLAYHALL COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To operate for the benefit of community in Clayhall area. To bring the community together for the betterment of area. To provide educational and recreational facilities to the kids.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Redbridge
Governance
- 27 May 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dewan Khan | Trustee | 08 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Javed Iqbal | Trustee | 08 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mirza Sujon Baig | Trustee | 08 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Badrul Alam Khan | Trustee | 08 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hassan Ali Hassan Mohamed MESALAM | Trustee | 05 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed khalid | Trustee | 05 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2019 | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.16k | £63.77k | £100.14k | £966.33k | £327.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.26k | £51.43k | £47.60k | £73.16k | £117.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £900.10k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £18.94k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £47.30k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £25.25k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £30.17k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £25.25k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £17.74k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 71 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 71 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 23 April 2024 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 23 April 2024 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 31 March 2023 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 31 March 2023 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 02 March 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 02 March 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 27 May 2014
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS AND DOCTRINES OF ISLAM. 2. TO PROMOTE RACIAL AND RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AND RESPECT OF THE BELIEFS AND PRACTICES OF DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS FAITHS. 3. TO RELIEVE THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL SICKNESS OF PERSONS IN NEED, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY REASON OF BEREAVEMENT, OR ADDICTION TO DRUGS AND ALCOHOL, AND RESIDENT IN CLAYHALL AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS, BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING. 4. TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF CLAYHALL AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Clayhall Community Centre
Heathcote Avenue
ILFORD
Essex
IG5 0QS
- Phone:
- 07830379557
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window