Hope In Haringey

Charity Number: 1155484
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Early intervention in 28 schools seeing over 400 troubled young people in 1 to 1 sessions. Youth Group work over 5 Tottenham estates engaging up to 300 young people a week. Mentoring & employment placements for young people000 using mentors & in partnership with Haringey & North East London. Pastoral support/chaplaincy of the Haringey Police Service.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Haringey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 January 2014: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • HIT (Previous name)
  • HOPE IN TOTTENHAM (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jeff Skinner Chair 20 June 2018
None on record
Resham Mirza Trustee 02 March 2023
HEP HORIZONS
Received: On time
Elizabeth Morris Trustee 02 March 2023
None on record
Pastor Tonye Philemon Trustee 02 March 2023
None on record
Anna Joy Lowe Trustee 01 January 2020
None on record
John Philip Christopher Stevenson Trustee 20 April 2019
None on record
Heather Annan Trustee 10 July 2018
None on record
REVEREND ALEX GYASI Trustee 10 July 2018
BALM IN GILEAD MINISTRIES BIRMINGHAM
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £312.07k £344.41k £410.00k £497.86k £507.95k
Total expenditure £318.30k £294.01k £384.01k £552.04k £550.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £124.64k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £382.56k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £10
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £744
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £522.45k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £27.75k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £900
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.51k
Long-term investments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Other assets N/A N/A N/A N/A £74.59k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A N/A N/A £26.32k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 10 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 10 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 19 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 19 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 03 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 03 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 14 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Room 22
The Trampery
639 High Rd
Tottenham
London
Phone:
07771867359