THE DADDRYSHIELD INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides use of community hall.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Total income includes £8,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Durham
Governance
- 16 May 1975: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR MALCOLM NATTRAS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL LESLIE COULTHARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JONATHON MARK NODDINGS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER GRANGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EDWARD JOHNSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR MICHAEL PATTINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAMES RALPH NATTRASS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.05k | £2.17k | £1.91k | £14.74k | £10.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £692 | £693 | £666 | £757 | £706 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £12.64k | £8.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 102 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 102 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 468 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 468 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 March 2023 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED THE 26 SEPTEMBER 1925
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF AN INSTITUTE OR PREMISES FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE BENEFICIAL AREA AND FOR ALL AND EVERY THE MEMBERS FOR THE TIME BEING OF THE SAID INSTITUTE FOR RELIGIOUS EDUCATIONAL LITERARY OR RECREATIVE PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
VILLAGE OF DADDRYSHIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
HIGH SAUGH SHIELDS
DADDRY SHIELD
BISHOP AUCKLAND
DL13 1NW
- Phone:
- 01388517345
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window