EUROPEAN COLLEGE OF VETERINARY CLINICAL PATHOLOGY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The primary objectives of the College are to advance veterinary clinical pathology, promote a high standard of veterinary clinical pathology and veterinary clinical pathologists practising in Europe, and to promote research in the area of veterinary clinical pathology in Europe.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 September 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
- Australia
- Austria
- Canada
- Denmark
- France
- Germany
- Greece
- Italy
- Netherlands
- Norway
- South Africa
- Spain
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- United States
Governance
- 03 December 2014: Standard registration
- ECVCP (Working name)
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Marta Costa | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Erika Furman | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr TIM WILLIAMS | Trustee | 06 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Francesco Cian | Trustee | 06 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR ALESSIA GIORDANO | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr KOSTAS PAPASOULIOTIS | Trustee | 04 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
DR ERNST LEIDINGER DVM | Trustee | 04 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/09/2019 | 01/09/2020 | 01/09/2021 | 01/09/2022 | 01/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.30k | £18.39k | £21.10k | £21.73k | £20.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.10k | £9.08k | £12.65k | £14.25k | £25.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 September 2023 | 14 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2021 | 17 July 2022 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2020 | 04 October 2021 | 95 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 September 2019 | 11 April 2021 | 284 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03 DEC 2002 AS AMENDED ON 10/02/2014 AS AMENDED ON 02/10/2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE COLLEGE SHALL BE TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN VETERINARY CLINICAL PATHOLOGY. IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT THE COLLEGE SHALL HAVE THE FOLLOWING POWERS: (A) TO ESTABLISH STANDARDS OF TRAINING, EXPERIENCE, AND EXAMINATION FOR QUALIFICATION AS A SPECIALIST IN VETERINARY CLINICAL PATHOLOGY IN EUROPE. (B) TO FURTHER THE RECOGNITION OF SUCH QUALIFIED SPECIALISTS BY SUITABLE CERTIFICATION AND OTHER MEANS IN EUROPE AS A RECOGNIZED COLLEGE OF THE EUROPEAN BOARD OF VETERINARY SPECIALISTS (EBVS). (C) TO DEVELOP AND SUPERVISE CONTINUING EDUCATION PROGRAMMES IN VETERINARY CLINICAL PATHOLOGY IN EUROPE. (D) TO ENCOURAGE AND PROMOTE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF STANDARDS FOR THE PERFORMANCE OF LABORATORY PROCEDURES IN VETERINARY CLINICAL PATHOLOGY IN EUROPE. (E) TO FURTHER RESEARCH AND SCIENTIFIC PROGRESS IN VETERINARY CLINICAL PATHOLOGY IN EUROPE BY ENCOURAGING EXCHANGE OF INFORMATION, EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND PUBLICATIONS IN PEER-REVIEWED JOURNALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Laburnum Close
Congleton
CW12 4TX
- Phone:
- 01260277908
- Email:
- secretariat@ecvcp.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window