MARINE LAKE ENTHUSIASTS (MARLENS)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Marlens looks after Clevedon Marine Lake on the North Somerset coast. It engages the community in using and caring for the lake, maintaining public access and improving the amenities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Somerset
Governance
- 28 March 2014: CIO registration
- MARINE LAKE ENTHUSIASTS (Working name)
- MARLENS (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Sarah Anne Swash | Chair | 15 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Victoria Sharp | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lilyblue Southam | Trustee | 18 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Donna Littleton | Trustee | 21 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Laura Emma Kate Nesbitt | Trustee | 21 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Julian Clouter | Trustee | 21 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Myles David Podmore | Trustee | 15 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Charles Perrott | Trustee | 15 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.60k | £27.64k | £38.44k | £86.10k | £43.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.75k | £27.81k | £17.93k | £57.25k | £35.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £20.01k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 07 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 07 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 02 September 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 02 September 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 17 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 17 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 28 Mar 2014
Charitable objects
1.TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES OR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 2.TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Newsham Hanson
Edinburgh House
1-5 Bellevue Road
Clevedon
North Somerset
BS21 7NP
- Phone:
- 07796224483
- Website:
-
clevedonmarinelake.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window