HARROGATE SPA TENNIS CENTRE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of community participation in healthy recreation by the provision of facilities for the playing of tennis for the benefit of the inhabitants of the Harrogate & Knaresbro' district. The facilities to be made available on a non-discriminatory basis for the public at large in the interests of social welfare and with the object of improving the conditions of the life for said inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 19 November 2013: Standard registration
- HSTC LTD (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steve Reffitt | Chair | 06 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sophie-Anne Sharples | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Charters | Trustee | 01 March 2016 |
|
|||||
Chris Dight | Trustee | 18 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL BENTLEY | Trustee | 29 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.72k | £224.24k | £494.50k | £790.14k | £180.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.84k | £38.07k | £102.86k | £78.23k | £240.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £747.70k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £41.29k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.16k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £78.23k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £8.97k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 June 2024 | 129 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 June 2024 | 129 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/06/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29/10/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12/11/2013
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('OBJECTS') ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: (1) THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF TENNIS/TABLE TENNIS. (2) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF HARROGATE, KNARESBOROUGH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HSTC Ltd
Claro Park
Harrogate
HG1 4BB
- Phone:
- 01423508490
- Email:
- hstc@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window