Financial history RNAS CULDROSE CENTRAL FUND

Charity number: 1154674
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £39.65k £9.61k £21.25k £56.28k £143.58k
Total expenditure £36.90k £10.46k £25.08k £66.61k £95.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A