RNAS CULDROSE CENTRAL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of efficiency of the armed forces of the crown by the provision and support of facilities and activities for the efficiency and well-being of Service personnel permanently attached to RNAS Culdrose
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
Governance
- 20 November 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THE COMMANDING OFFICER RNAS CULDROSE | Trustee | 19 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.65k | £9.61k | £21.25k | £56.28k | £143.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.90k | £10.46k | £25.08k | £66.61k | £95.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 18 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 18 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 17 June 2024 | 109 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 17 June 2024 | 109 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 MAY 2013
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECT (THE OBJECT) IS 'THE PROMOTION OF EFFICIENCY OF THE ARMED FORCES OF THE CROWN BY THE PROVISION AND SUPPORT OF FACILITIES AND ACTIVITIES FOR THE EFFICIENCY AND WELL-BEING OF SERVICE PERSONNEL'.
Contact information
- Address:
-
R N A S Culdrose
Hms Seahawk
Helston
TR12 7RH
- Phone:
- 01326552226
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window