Financial history LIVERPOOL SOUTH DEANERY

Charity Number: 1158339
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £42.94k £97
Total expenditure £24.67k £808 £3.01k £7.48k £42.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A