LIBERTY CHURCH LONDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OUR OBJECT, AS STATED IN OUR ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION, IS, "FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN THE CITY OF LONDON AND IN OTHER SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT."
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
23 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- City Of London
Governance
- 05 December 2013: Standard registration
- LIBERTY CHURCH (Working name)
- LIBERTY CHURCH (Previous name)
- LIBERTY CHURCH LONDON (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Mazzella | Chair | 20 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Pettman | Trustee | 29 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Gibson | Trustee | 29 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Megan Kumar | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gethin Amoss | Trustee | 31 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Sadler | Trustee | 20 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £249.32k | £398.88k | £398.88k | £147.74k | £173.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £214.36k | £352.72k | £352.72k | £187.27k | £155.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 November 2023 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 November 2023 | 29 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 November 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 November 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 01 November 2022 | 154 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 01 November 2022 | 154 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18 JUL 2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 23/01/2014
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECT IS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN THE CITY OF LONDON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Liberty Church London
International House
36-38 Cornhill
LONDON
EC3V 3NG
- Phone:
- 07377997274
- Email:
- london@libertychurch.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window