EVALUATE TEES VALLEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We deliver Relationship and Sex Education in secondary and primary schools. We use prepared multimedia presentations appropriate to the ages of the children in each age group.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2015
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Darlington
- Hartlepool
- Middlesbrough
- Redcar And Cleveland
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- 20 November 2013: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Ken Toop | Chair | 29 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Annalise Higgins | Trustee | 15 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
ATHENE WHERRETT | Trustee | 29 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CHARLES DOWNS | Trustee | 29 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.92k | £8.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.15k | £14.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 333 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 333 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 699 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 699 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1064 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1064 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1429 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1429 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1794 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1794 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 20 Nov 2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO ADVANCE EDUCATION INCLUDING BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SEX AND RELATIONSHIP EDUCATION TO CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN PRIMARY AND SECONDARY SCHOOLS IN THE TEES VALLEY AREA AND SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
604 YARM ROAD
EAGLESCLIFFE
STOCKTON-ON-TEES
TS16 0DQ
- Phone:
- 01642780780
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window