Financial history EPIC KIDZ

Charity Number: 1156202
Charity reporting is up to date (91 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £84.84k £132.76k £77.19k £154.26k £101.98k
Total expenditure £65.78k £96.58k £103.15k £141.78k £144.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A