EPIC KIDZ

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants are awarded to voluntary groups throughout the North West, who provide sports, leisure and health orientated activities for young people. These groups include local sports clubs, scouts, youth clubs and children with special needs. We also provide grants for other charities involved with mountain recreational activities such as footpath repairs, mountain rescue and air ambulance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cumbria
- Lancashire
- Liverpool City
- Manchester City
- St Helens
- Wigan
Governance
- 14 March 2014: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARC LAITHWAITE BSC HONS | Chair | 20 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
TERENCE GILPIN | Trustee | 20 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £84.84k | £132.76k | £77.19k | £154.26k | £101.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.78k | £96.58k | £103.15k | £141.78k | £144.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 29 October 2024 | 91 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 29 October 2024 | 91 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 18 September 2023 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 18 September 2023 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 06 March 2023 | 219 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 06 March 2023 | 219 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 04 April 2022 | 248 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 04 April 2022 | 248 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 03 March 2021 | 216 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 03 March 2021 | 216 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14/03/2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 16 IN THE NORTH WEST OF ENGLAND BY ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE
Contact information
- Address:
-
308 Mossy Lea Road
Wrightington
WIGAN
WN6 9SA
- Phone:
- 01257251217
- Email:
- info@epicevents.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window