WINCOBANK VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing a community building for activities in Wincobank, Sheffield. We have the following regular activities: ? youth club ? toddler group ? two exercise classes ? Weightwatchers ? community socials We also held one off events such as: ? Macmillan Coffee morning ? craft Fair ? Christmas Fair ? numerous children?s parties for the local community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 20 November 2013: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Gooden | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Lesley Jean Lattimer | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Colin France | Trustee | 08 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Alan Crompton | Trustee | 13 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
Zoe Andrews | Trustee | 12 October 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||
Anne Crompton | Trustee | 12 October 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||
Lisa Swann-Ferris | Trustee | 12 October 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||
Pat Gatley | Trustee | 12 October 2016 |
|
|||||||||||
PETER PRICE MBE | Trustee | 18 November 2013 |
|
|||||||||||
Peter Foyle | Trustee | 18 November 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.86k | £25.49k | £20.19k | £32.91k | £26.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.69k | £6.70k | £16.23k | £33.59k | £28.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 20 Nov 2013
Charitable objects
(1)THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO("THE OBJECTS")ARE:(A)TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF WINCOBANK,SHEFFIELD AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD,WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION,DISABILITY,AGE,RACE,NATIONALITY OR OF POLITICAL,RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES,VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO RELIEVE POVERTY,TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND FOR LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS(B)IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE,THE CIO SHALL HAVE POWER TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CIO IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wincobank Village Hall Trust
Wincobank Village Hall
Newman Road
SHEFFIELD
S9 1LQ
- Phone:
- 01142443529
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window