Financial history SALTBURN FRIENDS OF THE VALLEY LTD

Charity number: 1155797
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £14.80k £5.32k £7.62k £5.30k £6.18k
Total expenditure £11.96k £5.82k £10.74k £4.07k £6.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A