SAILADAY OK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. Reduce disadvantage and social exclusion by giving relief and rehabilitation to those recovering from addictions, abuse and trauma by provision of therapeutic sailing and marine-based adventure therapies. 2. Educate therapists and skippers in the benefits of therapeutic sailing and marine-based adventure therapy by providing a structured training programme including supervised practice.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Dorset
- Somerset
Governance
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2014 | 31/10/2015 | 31/10/2016 | 31/10/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.85k | £36.02k | £10.43k | £5.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.60k | £30.80k | £15.16k | £4.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2017 | 16 August 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2016 | 16 August 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2015 | 31 August 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2015 | 31 August 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24 OCT 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20/02/2014
Charitable objects
(1) THE RELIEF AND REHABILITATION OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED AS A RESULT OF RECOVERY FROM ADDICTION, ABUSE OR TRAUMA BY THE PROVISION OF THERAPEUTIC SAILING AND OTHER MARINE-BASED ADVENTURE THERAPIES AS ARE DEEMED APPROPRIATE BY THE TRUSTEES. (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE BENEFITS OF THERAPEUTIC SAILING AND OTHER MARINE-BASED ADVENTURE THERAPIES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window