Financial history CHURCH FENTON CRICKET CLUB

Charity Number: 1155045
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 21/11/2019 21/11/2020 21/11/2021 21/11/2022 21/11/2023
Total gross income £9.25k £5.93k £8.48k £7.40k £10.22k
Total expenditure £7.22k £5.97k £7.03k £8.77k £11.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.50k