WENDOVER SWIMMING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principle activty of the charity is the running of a Swimming pool, for use by individuals, private swim schools and local schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 05 December 2013: CIO registration
- 13 April 2016: Funds received from 1033317 WENDOVER TODDLERS
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Margaret Hobbs | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Charles Brown | Trustee | 11 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE JANE HARRINGTON | Trustee | 05 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £170.60k | £43.25k | £71.61k | £112.43k | £99.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £130.30k | £59.99k | £33.92k | £116.30k | £73.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 January 2025 | 88 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 January 2025 | 88 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 December 2020 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 December 2020 | 47 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 05 Dec 2013
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WENDOVER AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, BY THE PROVISION OF A SWIMMING POOL AND SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Numbers
32 High Street
WENDOVER
BUCKINGHAMSHIRE
- Phone:
- 01296 620220
- Website:
-
wendoverswimmingpool.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window