CAMEROON CATALYST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE OBJECT OF THE CAMEROON CATALYST IS TO EMPOWER VILLAGE COMMUNITIES ACROSS THE NORTHEAST OF CAMEROON, WEST AFRICA AND IMPROVE LIVING CONDITIONS AND WELLBEING, ESPECIALLY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF WATER, EDUCATION, HEALTH CARE, HOUSING, RENEWABLE ENERGY, AND MICROBUSINESS. FROM 2014/15 ONWARD, CAMEROON CATALYST IS FOCUSING ON THE PROVISION OF IMPROVED WATER SOURCES IN CAMEROON'S EASTERN REGION
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cameroon
Governance
- 12 February 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas Henderson Edwards MEng | Chair | 31 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Cox | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sebastian Denner | Trustee | 16 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE WATSON MENG | Trustee | 12 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK ARMAND MBALLA | Trustee | 12 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.74k | £6.87k | £18.87k | £13.62k | £22.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.98k | £8.69k | £9.52k | £12.55k | £23.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 29 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2019
(These accounts |
29 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED ON 12/02/2014
Charitable objects
(1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND GOOD HEALTH THROUGH THE DELIVERY OF COMMUNITY LED INFRASTRUCTURE DEVELOPMENTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN CAMEROON (AND AFRICA) (2) THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES OF CAMEROON (AND AFRICA), IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN THE DEVELOPMENT OF THEIR SOCIETY (3) THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT IN CAMEROON (AND AFRICA) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: (A) THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF RESOURCES (B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES (C) THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT MEANS DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 6
Stockwood Court
19 St. Winifreds Road
BOURNEMOUTH
BH2 6NY
- Phone:
- 07539015337
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window