LITTLE JOHN'S HOUSE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of poverty and sickness (whether physical or mental), the advancement of education for public benefit and the preservation and protection of good health.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Devon
- Romania
Governance
- 24 March 2014: CIO registration
- 03 November 2015: Funds received from 1002714 ORPHAN AID
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR RICH FRY | Chair | 06 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Anelisa Zaharia | Trustee | 30 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ailsa McEwan | Trustee | 30 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Louise Bryce | Trustee | 24 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Bryce | Trustee | 24 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH HARRIS | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
LIVIU ZAHARIA | Trustee | 06 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARIANNE THERESA CHEDGEY | Trustee | 06 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
RUTH FRY | Trustee | 06 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
MR DAVE CHEDGEY | Trustee | 06 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
MS BETH YORATH | Trustee | 06 December 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.30k | £42.11k | £73.82k | £62.55k | £79.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.82k | £200.68k | £69.10k | £105.37k | £97.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 24 Mar 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS (WHETHER PHYSICAL OR MENTAL), THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
10-12 New Street
TORRINGTON
EX38 8BN
- Phone:
- 01835938227
- Email:
- tillyjohn@timetalk.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window