CHASDEI USHER

Charity number: 1155312
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Relief of poverty

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Salford City
  • Israel

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 January 2014: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GABRIEL ROTHBART Trustee 31 October 2013
STERVON LTD
Received: 112 days late
KESSER CHARITIES LIMITED
Received: 41 days late
M & E CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: 109 days late
RAV TOV
Received: On time
CHASDEI YOEL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
NORTH WEST CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
ARI ROTH Trustee 31 October 2013
RAV TOV
Received: On time
CHASDEI YOEL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £36.63k £11.46k £12.00k £19.10k £0
Total expenditure £43.63k £11.93k £10.96k £7.98k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 09 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 14 November 2023 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 19 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
158 Cromwell Road
SALFORD
M6 6DE
Phone:
01617929461
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available