Financial history ARCH Teesside

Charity number: 1154766
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £683.57k £758.47k £760.85k £707.79k £950.01k
Total expenditure £621.69k £594.68k £659.54k £763.33k £910.04k
Income from government contracts £350.89k £308.44k £279.42k £288.29k £327.79k
Income from government grants £90.72k £136.08k N/A N/A £30.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £682.67k £757.74k £760.17k £705.09k £942.18k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £901 £730 £678 £2.70k £7.83k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £757.74k £0 £705.09k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £621.69k £594.68k £659.54k £763.33k £910.04k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £13.37k £0 £18.38k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0