TILFORD AND RUSHMOOR TENNIS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a community tennis club, accessible to all. We enable local children to learn to play tennis. We encourage the uptake of fitness and sporting endeavour amongst all age groups. We run social tennis events and also tournaments. We have regular coaching sessions on the courts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 07 March 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR ANTHONY CERULLO | Chair | 18 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW READ | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
GAVIN SWARZENBACH | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
GEORGINA HAMILTON | Trustee | 12 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP ANDREW KENT | Trustee | 25 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr ROBERT PEARSON | Trustee | 25 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
HOWARD JOHN BEST | Trustee | 25 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
KAREN JOY SWEET | Trustee | 25 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
LUKE HOLLOWAY | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
KARL KNIGHTS | Trustee | 20 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Frank Bell | Trustee | 21 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.85k | £8.62k | £10.62k | £7.33k | £11.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.65k | £4.01k | £9.36k | £6.49k | £6.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 15 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 FEB 2010 AS AMENDED ON 27/02/2014
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF TILFORD AND RUSHMOOR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING TENNIS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Riversmeet
Tilford Street
Tilford
FARNHAM
GU10 2BW
- Phone:
- 01252782191
- Email:
- info@trtennis.org.uk
- Website:
-
trtennis.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window