Financial history CRICKET WITHOUT BOUNDARIES

Charity number: 1154576
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £81.98k £47.40k £25.00k £75.71k £144.14k
Total expenditure £87.69k £60.25k £36.00k £56.31k £174.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A