Financial history DENTON HOLME COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1157624
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £83.74k £40.15k £43.79k £31.44k £38.89k
Total expenditure £30.31k £27.34k £30.23k £32.94k £37.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £27.95k N/A £11.13k £9.00k £9.00k